AFRICAN SMILE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING IMPARTIAL AND CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE & GUIDANCE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT. OFFERING LIFE SKILLS, ENGLISH TRAINING, SKILLS FOR CARE, INTERPERSONAL, EMPLOYABILITY AND DIGITAL SKILLS. RUNNING SUPPLEMENTARY CLASSES TO HELP YOUTHS IMPROVE THEIR SCHOOL RESULTS, CULTURAL ACTIVITIES TO CHANGE THEIR BEHAVIOUR AND STEER AWAY FROM THE GANG AND DRUG-RELATED CRIME
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £13,959 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 May 2005: Standard registration
- AFRICAN PROJECTS CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yves Kabare Degree | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER KYOLABA Degree | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SYMPHORIEN BANTTANTOU | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE AKINLOYE AKINWUMI DEVEL. OFF | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
OKITO DIMBA TAKONDANYA DR | Trustee | 30 November 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.69k | £21.85k | £23.17k | £24.63k | £24.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.58k | £20.94k | £22.94k | £24.10k | £24.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £9.00k | N/A | £16.32k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.98k | £2.45k | £5.44k | £8.31k | £13.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED 22 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS, PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH ADVANCE EDUCATION OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS LIVING IN SOUTH EAST OF LONDON, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE IN MATTERS SUCH AS HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT, TRANSLATION SERVICES, HOUSING AND WELFARE RIGHTS. 2. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF AFRICAN COMMUNITY LIVING IN SOUTH EAST OF LONDON THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, CULTURAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL DIFFICULTIES OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
46 Combedale Road
London
SE10 0LG
- Phone:
- 02039528963
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window