SEWA-EDUCATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide West African music and dance workshops for schools and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 November 2004: Standard registration
- 03 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SEWA (Working name)
- SEWA BEATS EDUCATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 29/02/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.26k | £65.48k | £38.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.46k | £89.40k | £39.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 04 January 2009 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 20 February 2008 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 29 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8 APRIL 2004 AND RESOLUTION DATED 19 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF AFRICAN ART AND CULTURE GENERALLY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN AFRICAN MUSIC AND DANCE; AND B) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO DISADVANTAGED PERSONS IN ORDER TO ENABLE THEM TO ENGAGE IN AND CONTRIBUTE TO AFRICAN MUSIC AND DANCE ACTIVITIES, WHO COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD TO CONTRIBUTE OT TAKE PART IN SUCH ACTIVITIES THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window