THE FRIENDS OF CHELMSFORD MUSEUMS

Charity Number: 1106243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE CHELMSFORD MUSEUMS SERVICE THROUGH ACTIVITIES OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £2,705
Total expenditure: £2,359

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 October 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FCM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Frederick Norris Trustee 23 September 2024
None on record
CAROL ANNE AKEROYD Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
PATRICK TRAFFORD ALLEN Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
EDWARD ALLEN DYER Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
ROBERT FRANCIS HALL Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
DAVID GEORGE BUCKLEY Trustee 04 January 2017
None on record
ROSALIND JEAN WEBB Trustee 21 September 2004
None on record
DAVID LEWIS JONES Trustee 30 September 1999
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £3.48k £1.90k £2.19k £3.07k £2.71k
Total expenditure £1.58k £1.19k £996 £1.86k £2.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 21 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 06 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 10 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
294 Linnet Drive
CHELMSFORD
CM2 8AJ
Phone:
01245268879