JOSEPH CYRIL BAMFORD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity is currently inactive
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN ERNEST ROBERT OVENS | Chair |
|
||||||||||
THE LORD BAMFORD DL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
MARK BAMFORD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 08 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
3. THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECT ("THE OBJECTS"): 3.1 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM: - HEARING LOSS (INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION SENSORINEURAL HEARING LOSS DUE TO OVER EXPOSURE TO HIGH INTENSITY NOISE LEVELS IN THE WORKING ENVIRONMENT (INDUSTRIAL DEAFNESS)); - IMPAIRMENT OF VISION; AND CANCER; INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION: 3.1:1 THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ILLNESSES AND INJURIES; 3.2 THE PREVENTION OF SUFFERING BY THE PROMOTION OF GOOD PRACTICE IN INDUSTRY TO AVOID ACCIDENTS, INJURIES AND ILLNESSES (INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION INDUSTRIAL DEAFNESS); AND 3.3 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
J C BAMFORD EXCAVATORS LTD
LAKESIDE WORKS
DENSTONE ROAD
ROCESTER
UTTOXETER
ST14 5JP
- Phone:
- 01889593140
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window