Financial history THE COMMUNITY CHURCH BURTON AND DISTRICT

Charity Number: 1106795
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £51.26k £68.45k £67.67k £68.37k £113.26k
Total expenditure £54.16k £47.56k £54.69k £70.38k £71.36k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A