DRAGON CHRISTMAS CHARITY SALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dragon Christmas Charity Sale is held annually on the final morning of the Dragon School Christmas Term. More than 500 volunteers, made up of pupils, parents, teachers and staff work together to set up and run a variety of stalls and activities to raise money for charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 September 2004: Standard registration
- DRAGON SALE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Elizabeth Curtis | Chair | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosalee Rish | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Easton | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Johnson | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.21k | £53.98k | £151.26k | £147.71k | £158.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £241.16k | £104.97k | £149.19k | £167.62k | £174.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (AND PARTICULARLY THOSE BENEFITING CHILDREN AND FAMILIES) AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
DRAGON SCHOOL
BARDWELL ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6SS
- Phone:
- 01865315403
- Email:
- bursar@dragonschool.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window