THE CARON KEATING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects are to raise money for cancer charities, to relieve those persons with cancer, their families and carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 04 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY WINIFRED GLORIA HUNNIFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL DON KEATING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.98k | £23.94k | £61.36k | £96.70k | £102.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.56k | £542 | £157.20k | £63.88k | £204.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 February 2025 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 February 2025 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 March 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 March 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') (I) TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS WITH CANCER (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE SUFFERING FROM BREAST CANCER), THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME; (II) TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL NEED THE DEPENDENTS OF SUCH PERSONS OR THOSE THAT HAVE LOST THEIR LIFE TO CANCER (IN PARTICULAR BREAST CANCER); (III) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF SUCH PERSONS BY OFFERING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO OTHER CANCER CHARITIES, COMPLIMENTARY HEALTH PRACTITIONERS, SUPPORT GROUPS WORKING WITH CANCER PATIENTS AND TO SUCH OTHER GROUPS OR PERSONS SUPPORTING THOSE SUFFERING FROM CANCER (IN PARTICULAR BREAST CANCER) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME; AND (IV) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF CANCER (IN PARTICULAR BREAST CANCER) ON TERMS THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
P. O. BOX 122
SEVENOAKS
KENT
TN13 1UB
- Phone:
- 07787100854
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window