EMPLOYMENT RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of unemployment for the benefit of the public in such ways as may be thought fit including assistance to find employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 October 2004: Standard registration
- ERC (Working name)
- RESOURCE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Samuels | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Kate Fulton | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
PETER MUSGRAVE | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Anne Fenton | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Jeremy Kelly | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Shirley Fenster | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||
James Field | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Geoffrey Beral | Trustee | 24 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £335.19k | £320.36k | £338.90k | £333.96k | £286.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £325.92k | £304.83k | £327.02k | £347.10k | £401.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 AUGUST 2004 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 MARCH 2006. AS AMENDED ON 05 AUG 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 MAR 2017 as amended on 18 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Resource
894 High Road
London
N12 9RH
- Phone:
- 02083464000
- Email:
- office@resource-centre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window