Trustees CITY ARTS (NOTTINGHAM) LTD
Charity number: 1106088

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Richard Savage Cooper | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Christopher Robertson | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Greenaway Lady | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Strickson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kevin Love | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Parkinson | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Franks | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Butter Keon | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Boseda Olawoye | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michele Louise Alma Taylor | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.