Financial history CDH UK- THE CONGENITAL DIAPHRAGMATIC HERNIA CHARITY

Charity number: 1106065
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/06/2020 07/06/2021 07/06/2022 07/06/2023 07/06/2024
Total gross income £137.27k £78.89k £178.80k £196.99k £64.51k
Total expenditure £44.76k £271.63k £151.27k £127.98k £126.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A