CDH UK- THE CONGENITAL DIAPHRAGMATIC HERNIA CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CDH UK provides support and help to families affected by the medical condition Congenital Diaphragmatic Hernia (CDH). Anyone with any connection or interest in CDH is welcome to access the services we offer. We raise awareness and provide social activities. We contribute to medical research including awarding grants from our own research fund and participating in international networking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 September 2004: Standard registration
- CDH UK (Working name)
- CHERUBS UK (Working name)
- CHERUBS UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS BEV POWER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA LANE | Trustee | 28 June 2004 |
|
|
||||
DONNA FAHEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/06/2020 | 07/06/2021 | 07/06/2022 | 07/06/2023 | 07/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.27k | £78.89k | £178.80k | £196.99k | £64.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.76k | £271.63k | £151.27k | £127.98k | £126.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 June 2023 | 06 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 June 2023 | 06 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 June 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 June 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/2011
Charitable objects
A. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY CONGENITAL DIAPHRAGMATIC HERNIA AND ANY RELATED CONDITION AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC INTO CONGENITAL DIAPHRAGMATIC HERNIA AND ITS IMPLICATIONS FOR THE FAMILY. C. THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, EFFECTS, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF CONGENITAL DIAPHRAGMATIC HERNIA AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Denes
Lynn Road
Tilney All Saints
King's Lynn
PE34 4RT
- Phone:
- 01553828382
- Email:
- committee@cdhuk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window