Financial history THE BENLLECH AND DISTRICT RECREATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1106087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £5.29k £11.23k £11.67k £11.75k £13.71k
Total expenditure £4.59k £6.00k £7.22k £11.62k £16.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A