ARC UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARC is an organisation of young people from across Europe who come together during the summer to live together and work as volunteers in a local cathedral or church. The letters ARC demonstrate the three principal aims of the organisation: accueil (welcome), rencontre (encounter) and communaute (community).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 October 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Spain
Governance
- 12 October 2005: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 April 2011: Re-registered
- 09 April 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/10/2008 | 02/10/2009 | 06/10/2010 | 06/10/2011 | 06/10/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £803 | £1.08k | £541 | £345 | £450 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.18k | £1.27k | £959 | £534 | £422 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2012 | 14 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2011 | 04 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MARCH 2004, AS AMENDED 27 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE PROMOTION OF ECUMENISM BY THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEER GUIDES AT CHURCHES AND CATHEDRALS PARTICIPATING IN THE ARC SCHEME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window