THE AUGER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to support its charitable objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- India
- Kenya
Governance
- 03 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chandni Mehta | Trustee | 30 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MENAL MAHENDRA MEHTA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NISHA MEHTA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.69k | £58.40k | £315.57k | £236.00k | £286.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.50k | £60.83k | £294.98k | £242.60k | £279.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2022 | 285 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2022 | 285 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED 21 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE A) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP WORLDWIDE; AND B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO ADVANCE ISLAM, JANISM, HINDUISM AND CHRISTIANITY WORLDWIDE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL & OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Green Lane
Watford
WD19 4NJ
- Phone:
- 08447705001
- Email:
- Nisha@mehtahome.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window