CENTRAL ENGLAND SOMALI ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S MAIN ACTIVITIES IS TO PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION & GUIDANCE TO CENTRAL ENGLAND SOMALI COMMUNITY & TO ENABLE THEM ACCESS SERVICES FROM STATUTORY & VOLUNTARY SECTORS FOR THEIR INTEGRATION INTO THE WIDER SOCIETY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 21 October 2004: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 November 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yusuf Hassan Warsame | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
IBRAHIM ABDULLAH HASSAN | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ABDI AHMED BULALE | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
RAWI MOHAMOUD SAEED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDI OSMAN OGLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2025 | 721 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 414 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN WEST MIDLAND (HEREIN AFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR), TO ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION, PROMOTE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH REPRESENTATIVES OF THE COMMUNITY, STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 Grange Road
Small Heath
Birmingham
B10 9QT
- Phone:
- 01216791041
- Email:
- cesorganisation1@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window