WELLINGTON (SOMERSET) & DISTRICT ARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote, support and provide arts activities and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 04 October 2004: Standard registration
- ARTS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- WAA (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey William Cross | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Alexandra Knighton | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON SPALDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW REDSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.81k | £134.15k | £40.54k | £59.21k | £57.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.12k | £107.85k | £47.00k | £67.45k | £52.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF DRAMA, SINGING, MUSIC AND VISUAL ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WELLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ARTS CENTRE
EIGHT ACRE LANE
WELLINGTON
SOMERSET
TA21 8PS
- Phone:
- 01823667774
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window