BRIXTON HILL ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education among Muslim community in UK through the provision of Islamic culture & heritage, supplementary classes.The relief of poverty, sickness and stress by promoting culture & identity.To identify issues of common concern to women,Children and Young adult in the areas of health, education,personal development. To relief of poverty, sickness Banadir regions of Somalia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
- Somalia
Governance
- 18 October 2004: Standard registration
- SOCFIA (Previous name)
- SOMALI CENTRE FOR INFORMATION AND ADVOCACY UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dahir Abukar Mohamud | Chair | 03 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALI HASSAN HUSSEIN | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ABDULKADIR MOHAMOUD HADAAFOW | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED ALI HASSAN | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR MOHAMED ROOBLE MOHAMED | Trustee | 03 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ABDULLAHI MOHAMED SHEGOW | Trustee | 03 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ABDI ALI ALASOW | Trustee | 03 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.60k | £80.95k | £70.99k | £73.20k | £72.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.30k | £69.16k | £67.60k | £66.58k | £71.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AMONG YOUTHS IN THE UK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SUPPLEMENTARY CLASSES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND STRESS PARTICULARLY AMONG SOMALIA PEOPLE BY PROMOTING RELEVANT CULTURES AND IDENTIFY AND PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT ON SUCH MATTERS AS HOUSING, TRANSLATION, SOCIAL SECURITY, EMPLOYMENT AND HEALTH. (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN PARTICULAR YOUNG WOMEN AND CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
AMONG YOUTHS IN THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
226A-228A
BRIXTON HILL
LONDON
SW2 1HE
- Phone:
- 020335839729
- Email:
- info@bhic.org.uk
- Website:
-
bhic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window