Financial history KIDASHA

Charity number: 1106156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £555.80k £335.96k £466.53k £445.71k £405.22k
Total expenditure £419.25k £320.36k £448.95k £518.28k £509.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £70.18k £77.34k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £554.03k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £1.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.23k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £536 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £382.59k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £36.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.93k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A