THE SYBIL OWEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To distribute or accumulate income in such a manner as the trustees shall think fit, and to distribute income or capital exclusively for charitable subjects & purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ireland
- Malaysia
Governance
- 04 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID SHIEBERT | Chair | 28 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Danillene Quinto | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.07k | £7.13k | £4.41k | £6.48k | £8.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £6.60k | £5.02k | £4.88k | £8.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
2.3 A) THE PROPERTY SPECIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE; B) ALL MONEY, INVESTMENTS OF OTHER PROPERTY PAID OR TRANSFERRED BY ANY PERSON, TO OR SO AS TO BE UNDER THE CONTROL OF, AND, IN EITHER CASE, ACCEPTED BY THE TRUSTEE AS ADDITIONS; C) ALL ACCUMULATIONS (IF ANY) OF INCOME AND D) THE MONEY, INVESTMENTS AND PROPERTY FROM, TIME TO TIME REPRESENTING THE ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Photiades Solicitors
36-38 London Road
St. Albans
AL1 1NG
- Phone:
- 01727833134
- Email:
- davidshiebert@photiades.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window