Accounts and annual returns THE FAMILY FRIENDLY CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 1106193
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2014 24 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2013 16 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required