Financial history AL-MUSTAFA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1111654
Charity reporting is up to date (240 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £115.35k £74.33k £41.74k £130.45k £54.43k
Total expenditure £102.24k £150.22k £141.67k £77.05k £273
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A