Financial history TAG PET RESCUE

Charity number: 1110837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £249.59k £332.57k £303.17k £438.32k £379.05k
Total expenditure £233.00k £222.49k £272.37k £306.69k £420.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £99.27k £8.71k N/A N/A