WEST STOKE VILLAGE HALL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RUNNING AND UPKEEP OF WEST STOKE VILLAGE HALL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 May 2006: Standard registration
- WEST STOKE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN MILES | Chair | 01 February 2011 |
|
|
||||
Sheena King | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Rivaz Mr | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM CHARLES VINALL | Trustee | 01 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
Michael O'Connell | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.23k | £15.18k | £3.31k | £5.02k | £5.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.49k | £7.67k | £3.77k | £4.20k | £5.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 3 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEST STOKE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OF OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; (2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (3) TO PROMOTE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF WEST STOKE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, AND TO PROVIDE RELIEF FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ITS RESIDENTS OF ALL AGES; AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE AFOREMENTIONED RESIDENTS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE LIFE OF THEIR COMMUNITY IN WAYS WHICH ADDRESS AND ALLEVIATE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
WEST STOKE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRAMBLE COTTAGE
EAST ASHLING
CHICHESTER
PO18 9AX
- Phone:
- 01243575461
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window