THE BUTTS BISLEY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Until July 2014 we provided a day Centre is open from 9.30am to 3.00pm providing friendship and a hot lunch. The Centre closed in July 2014 following a the local council's decision to no longer support the Centre with a maintenance grant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 October 2004: Standard registration
- 20 February 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED WITHIN THE PARISHES OF BISLEY, CHOBHAM, WEST END AND WINGLESHAM IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREINAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES TO BE CHARITABLE, AND IN PARTICULAR TO MANAGE THE CENTRE KNOWN AS "THE BUTTS, BISLEY CENTRE".
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF BISLEY, CHOBHAM, WEST END AND WINGLESHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window