Accounts and annual returns OLLERTON ST PAULINUS COMMUNITY AND CHURCH HALL PROJECT

Charity Number: 1107427
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 April 2018 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 April 2018 427 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 02 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required