Dunsmore Nepal Textile Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TRAINING OF WEAVERS AND KNITTERS IN IMPOVERISHED REGION OF NEPAL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nepal
Governance
- 13 December 2004: Standard registration
- JOHN DUNSMORE TRUST (Previous name)
- NONE (Previous name)
- THE DUNSMORE NEPALESE TEXTILE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE JOHN DUNSMORE NEPALESE TEXTILE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE WARE | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROGER THOMAS HARDWICK MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE WILLITTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGUS WILLIAMS BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70 | £191 | £483 | £1.81k | £1.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.30k | £178 | £1.42k | £1.17k | £3.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 SEP 2004 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2004 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAR 2017 as amended on 27 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN NEPAL, PARTICULARLY IN REMOTE RURAL AREAS, BY THE SUPPLY OF EQUIPMENT FOR TEXTILE PRODUCTION AND THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, TRAINING AND SUPPORT IN THE MANUFACTURE AND MARKETING OF LOCALLY MADE TEXTILE PRODUCTS WITH THE AIM OF ENABLING THOSE IN NEED TO BECOME SELF-SUPPORTING.
Area of benefit
NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 ELIOT PLACE
LONDON
SE3 0QL
- Phone:
- 02088525225
- Email:
- roger2543@aol.com
- Website:
-
nepalesenettle.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window