CHESHAM MUSEUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The museum promotes the local history and traditional industries of wood ware, boots, brushes and brewing. Display boards show the main items of interest. Exhibits include a Roman mosaic found locally. Screens show DVDs featuring aspects of the town. Books and DVDs of local interest are available for sale. Due to the rent payable the museum has left its former premises and seeks a new home..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £575 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 02 December 2004: Standard registration
- 21 December 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 December 2018: Funds transferred to 1172671 CHESHAM MUSEUM
- CHESHAM MUSEUM - THE STABLES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.65k | £28.46k | £41.72k | £28.61k | £21.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.09k | £27.25k | £31.92k | £33.81k | £30.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £200 | £575 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 19 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 13 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 30 November 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 12 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window