NIAZ FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHARITY PROVIDES EDUCATION FOR SPECIAL NEED CHILDRENS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Pakistan
Governance
- 02 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
hassan khan | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Imran Khan | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
MUNEEZA NIAZI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED AYAZ NIAZI | Trustee |
|
||||||
BASHIR KARIM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HASSAN AKHTER NIAZI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.98k | £36.45k | £41.51k | £55.99k | £28.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.37k | £16.74k | £21.80k | £30.34k | £24.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN PAKISTAN, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OR DISABILITIES, REGARDLESS OF FAITH (THE BENEFICIARIES) BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AND WHERE DEEMED NECESSARY FINANCIAL SUPPORT. B. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG THE BENEFICIARIES, THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS AND LOCAL COMMUNITIES, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR A PURPOSE BUILT EDUCATIONAL FACILITY, MEDICAL CENTRE AND EMERGENCY AMBULANCE SERVICE.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 THORNTON ROAD
LONDON
SW12 0LL
- Phone:
- 07815151439
- Email:
- info@niazfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window