A.S.I.A. (ACADEMY OF SOUTH INDIAN ARTS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATE & PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY & IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN, & DISABLED PERSONS, IN THE APPRECIATION, PRACTICE & PRESENTATION OF CLASSICAL SOUTH ASIAN PERFORMING ARTS. TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR, ENCOURAGE & FACILITATE PARTICIPATION OF INDIVIDUALS THROUGH EXHIBITIONS, WORKSHOPS, ARTS FESTIVALS & PERFORMANCES WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING INTEGRATION & INCLUSION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 October 2004: Standard registration
- 11 July 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 August 2011: Re-registered
- 05 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- A.S.I.A. (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.83k | £5.02k | £5.99k | £5.26k | £4.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.66k | £4.98k | £5.54k | £5.20k | £4.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 05 May 2017 | 186 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN, DISABLED PERSONS AND THE ELDERLY, IN THE APPRECIATION, PRACTICE AND PRESENTATION OF CLASSICAL SOUTH INDIAN PERFORMING ARTS. (2) TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR, ENCOURAGE AND FACILITATE PARTICIPATION OF INDIVIDUALS THROUGH EXHIBITIONS, WORKSHOPS, ARTS FESTIVALS, PROFESSIONAL AND AMATEUR PERFORMANCES AND PRESENTATIONS WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING INTEGRATION AND INCLUSION. THE CHARITY'S AREA OF OPERATION WILL BE IN ENGLAND AND WALES..
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window