Governing document UNDERSTANDING ISLAM UK

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 22 APRIL 2005, 25 NOVEMBER 2005, 10 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 24 OCTOBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION’S OBJECTIVES ARE: (1). THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE MESSAGE OF ISLAM AS UNDERSTOOD BY THE COLLECTIVITY OF THE COMPANIONS OF PROPHET MUHAMMAD(PBUH) PASSED ON TO THE SUBSEQUENT MUSLIM GENERATIONS, SOLELY THROUGH INFORMATION, EDUCATION AND DIALOGUE; USING ONLY NON POLITICAL MEANS. (2). TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN AN ISLAMIC CENTRE SOLELY FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FOR ALL AND SUNDRY WITH A VIEW TO INSTILL HARMONY AMONG DIFFERENT MUSLIM GROUPS AND INCULCATE PEACE AND UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN THOSE WHO FOLLOW FAITH AND THOSE WHO DON’T. (3). TO PROVIDE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION TO CHILDREN ENSURING THAT THEY BECOME PEACE LOVING, CARING AND CIVILISED CITIZENS OF BRITISH SOCIETY. PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WILL BE PART OF THE ISLAMIC CENTRE. (4). TO PROMOTE INTEGRATION AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY IN THE UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.