Financial history BRENT NORTH YOUTH SPORTS PILOT PROJECT

Charity Number: 1108300
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010
Total gross income £162.01k £135.44k £75.85k £25.16k £25.72k
Total expenditure £170.08k £129.07k £86.48k £27.55k £26.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A