KINGSGATE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity Number: 1106273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advancement of the Christian Faith, Relief of persons who are poor and needy and the advancement of education on the basis of Christian principals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Leicestershire
  • Peterborough City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 October 2004: Standard registration
  • 06 October 2022: Funds received from 1144216 THE WELL HEAD CENTRE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • PETERBOROUGH COMMUNITY CHURCH (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr DAVID ANDREW SMITH Chair
None on record
ADERONKE LYDIA OPAYINKA Trustee 07 January 2023
None on record
SAMSON OLUWASINA ABIOYE Trustee 29 April 2021
JESUS THE WAY, THE TRUTH AND THE LIFE MINISTRIES LONDON (AKA) DIVINE CONNECTION CHURCH
Received: On time
Matthew Negus Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
BARRY FEATHERSTONE Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
NORMAN PASKIN Trustee 09 July 2015
HEALING ROOMS ENGLAND & WALES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.57m £4.05m £3.74m £4.05m £4.79m
Total expenditure £4.17m £3.31m £3.12m £3.71m £3.95m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £155.97k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £87.50k £106.26k £155.97k £13.62k £71.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.44m £3.18m £3.19m £3.28m £4.00m
Income - Other trading activities £792.12k £313.24k £114.68k £243.34k £362.29k
Income - Charitable activities £342.38k £344.89k £393.27k £524.65k £425.41k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £206.60k £42.25k £7.21k £1.30k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.63m £3.02m £2.97m £3.51m £3.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £540.53k £297.40k £154.53k £201.67k £278.42k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £12.96k £10.34k £11.82k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £9.46m £8.44m £8.52m £8.37m £8.25m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.84m £2.43m £2.60m £2.56m £2.64m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.63m £2.34m £1.96m £1.44m £546.12k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 06 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 November 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 STAPLEE WAY
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 4YT
Phone:
01733311156