Financial history GREATER LIFE TRUST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £53.33k £74.67k £67.09k £72.66k £75.98k
Total expenditure £61.00k £63.63k £79.16k £80.10k £76.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A