Parents and Teachers of the Hartford Schools
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for the Hartford Schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 27 October 2004: Standard registration
- 09 February 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 June 2018: Re-registered
- 09 February 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- H.I.F.I. (Working name)
- P.A.T.H.S (Working name)
- HARTFORD INFANTS FUNDRAISING INITIATIVE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.84k | £3.49k | £2.61k | £2.64k | £3.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.91k | £2.85k | £2.77k | £2.82k | £1.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 19 February 2020 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 27 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 27 June 2018 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 2004 as amended on 30 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window