Financial history WINDSOR & MAIDENHEAD STARFISH SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1107872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £11.43k £7.05k £2.70k £7.26k £11.16k
Total expenditure £9.31k £5.44k £4.36k £9.46k £10.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A