FRIENDS OF HENBURY VIEW FIRST SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1106473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising for school pupils

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £6,799
Total expenditure: £6,656

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 October 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF HENBURY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kim Weir Chair 17 April 2024
None on record
Emma King Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Emma Samways Trustee 10 July 2020
None on record
Katie Holleyman Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record
Samantha Loder Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.89k £500 £3.70k £7.73k £6.80k
Total expenditure £9.30k £1.03k £1.88k £6.10k £6.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 24 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 29 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 02 June 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HENBURY VIEW FIRST SCHOOL
HILLSIDE ROAD
CORFE MULLEN
WIMBORNE
BH21 3TR
Phone:
07855775343
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available