ST JOHN AND ST JAMES CE PRIMARY SCHOOL, HACKNEY GOVERNORS' FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitiy is to help the children and staff of St John & St james School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hackney
Governance
- 03 February 2005: Standard registration
- 10 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED 24 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT ST JOHN AND ST JAMES CE PRIMARY SCHOOL HACKNEY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, MATERIALS OR EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. 2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED ASSOCIATED WITH ST JOHN AND ST JAMES CE PRIMARY SCHOOL HACKNEY, WHETHER PUPILS, PARENTS, CARERS OR STAFF.
Area of benefit
ST JOHN AND ST JAMES CE PRIMARY SCHOOL, HACKNEY IN GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window