Foundry House Community Centre, Pembroke Ltd

Charity number: 1106323
Charity reporting is up to date (64 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity works closely with the whole community to provide a focus for activities that are open to all in order to encourage individual wellbeing, social cohesion and a sense of community in Pembroke. The Charity owns and manages Foundry House Community Centre for the benefit of local people, groups and businesses.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £37,472
Total expenditure: £36,424

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Pembrokeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FOUNDRY HOUSE COMMUNITY CENTRE, PEMBROKE LTD (Previous name)
  • PEMBROKE 21C (Previous name)
  • PEMBROKE 21C COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cllr Lee Dennis Herring Trustee 11 October 2024
None on record
Adrienne Clare Poole Trustee 11 October 2024
None on record
Rhian Cowen Trustee 12 December 2023
None on record
Valerie Hazel McInally Trustee 29 January 2020
None on record
ANN ELIZABETH MORTENSON Trustee 29 January 2020
PEMBROKE & MONKTON LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
PEMBROKE TOWN WALLS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.97k £18.09k £16.29k £28.49k £37.47k
Total expenditure £17.91k £25.66k £38.58k £30.84k £36.42k
Income from government contracts £3.84k N/A £192 £8.89k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.00k £800 £2.79k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 January 2025 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 January 2025 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Foundry House Community Centre
Pembroke Ltd
Orange Way
Pembroke
SA71 4DR
Phone:
01646833451