Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ("RCCG") COURAGE CENTRE

Charity number: 1106309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £77.48k £96.05k £99.63k £148.38k £176.17k
Total expenditure £77.42k £44.64k £74.95k £95.63k £110.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A