Governing document HELENA PARTNERSHIPS LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/04/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/07/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS FORMED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. ITS CHARITABLE OBJECTS SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY: THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING AND MANAGING HOUSING, INCLUDING SOCIAL HOUSING, AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR POOR PEOPLE OR FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT FROM TIME TO TIME BY A REGISTERED SOCIETY REGISTERED AS A PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING WITH THE REGULATOR.
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.