THE CHILDREN'S FORTUNE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty and sickness and advance education among children and young adults throughout the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 October 2004: Standard registration
- 11 January 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.33k | £5.23k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.45k | £14.07k | £646 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 21 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 10 September 2008 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 15 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | 15 February 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 21 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 21 June 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS AROUND THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window