THE SAMANTHA JONES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and distress of children suffering from leukaemia and their families by the promotion of research into the causes and prevention of leukaemia and the prevision of support.financial and material assistance and such other sevices as the trustees shall from time to time in their absolute discresion determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LORRAINE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NATALIE Daniels | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.14k | £4.43k | £565 | £99 | £241 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.03k | £8.85k | £2.86k | £2.68k | £1.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2004, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM LEUKAEMIA AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND PREVENTION OF LEUKAEMIA AND THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, FINANCIAL AND MATERIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 GRAINS ROAD
DELPH
OLDHAM
OL3 5DS
- Phone:
- 01457829479
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window