Financial history RENAISSANCE READERS CLUB

Charity number: 1108527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £700 £450 £843 £2.21k £1.50k
Total expenditure £1.20k £1.05k £935 £2.50k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A