Accounts and annual returns THE FOUNDATION FOR THE AID OF BRITISH INVENTORS

Charity number: 1121618
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 25 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2008 25 February 2010 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required