THE MONTESSORI SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are to advance education (including social and physical education) through methods of learning and education developed by Maria Montessori
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Filby | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Knight | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAISY CLAIRE JANE AMANDA COCKBURN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 17/12/2021 | 17/12/2022 | 17/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.03k | £2.97k | £330 | £0 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £401 | £10.43k | £430 | £0 | £20 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 December 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 02 March 2021 | 306 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JUNE 2004 AND AS AMENDED 28 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) THROUGH METHODS OF LEARNING AND EDUCATION DEVELOPED BY MARIA MONTESSORI AND IN CONNECTION WITH THIS: 1. TO CONDUCT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY SCHOOLS, LEARNING OR DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS. ALSO, TO FUND THE ATTENDANCE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN CIRCUMSTANCES OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, AT FACILITIES CONDUCTED BY THE FOUNDATION. 2. TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, OF AND UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE, BY OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CHILD CARE FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES. SUCH DEVELOPMENT TO INCLUDE THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT AND ENABLING OF HEALTH AND WELLBEING (INTELLECTUAL, PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL), SOCIAL COHESION, EQUALITY, INCLUSION AND DIVERSITY. 3. TO TRAIN TEACHERS, TEACHING ASSISTANTS, EDUCATIONALISTS, PARENTS AND CARERS IN SUCH METHODS OF LEARNING AND EDUCATION. 4. TO DEVELOP E.U. AND OTHER INTERNATIONAL RELATIONSHIPS AND ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 STANFORD AVENUE
BRIGHTON
BN1 6FB
- Phone:
- 01273494924
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window