Financial history ALTON COMMUNITY PLAYSCHOOL

Charity number: 1106438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £307.47k £300.36k £329.99k £322.35k £337.11k
Total expenditure £271.62k £280.50k £353.80k £391.80k £383.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.91k £300.30k £329.99k £322.15k £336.27k