CYFEILLION HEN YSGOL LLANGWNNADL

Charity number: 1107122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To create and organize a Community Center for the use and benefit of the inhabitants of Llangwnnadl and district in the building known as Llangwnnadl Old School, and to enable the use of this facility by any interested parties regardless of race colour or creed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £848
Total expenditure: £1,336

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF THE OLD SCHOOL LLANGWNNADL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN TIERNEY Chair
None on record
HELEN ANN GRIFFITH Trustee
None on record
GILLIAN JANE TIERNEY Trustee
None on record
SIMON JOHN HOLTON JONES Trustee
None on record
GLENYS LLINOS PETERS Trustee
None on record
BRYN JONES Trustee
None on record
SUE SOARE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.07k £650 £500 £1.57k £848
Total expenditure £3.62k £1.77k £800 £4.18k £1.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 January 2025 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LLWYN HELYG
LLANGWNADL
PWLLHELI
LL53 8NS
Phone:
01758770252
Website:

No information available