Financial history THE HUTTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £42.87k £145.39k £194.90k £136.76k £113.64k
Total expenditure £279.85k £446.66k £193.68k £197.89k £211.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A