THE PRIMARY IMMUNODEFICIENCY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and seek to improve the diagnosis, treatment, health management and quality of life of all children and adults in the UK suffering from a primary immunodeficiency disorder. Achieve this objective through dynamic programmes of education, information, awareness creation, advocacy, practical assistance and services and ongoing investment into appropriate medical research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 December 2004: Standard registration
- 26 January 2012: Funds received from 803217 THE PRIMARY IMMUNODEFICIENCY ASSOCIATION
- 30 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PIA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £570.50k | £706.59k | £429.72k | £368.95k | £381.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £566.76k | £563.57k | £600.80k | £578.51k | £491.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £281.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £82.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £315.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £20.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £5.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £419.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £6.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £168.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 30 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 31 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 28 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 28 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 27 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 27 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS (AND THE MEMBERS OF THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES) SUFFERING FROM PRIMARY IMMUNE DEFICIENCIES. (II) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THESE CONDITIONS WITHIN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AMONG PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC. (III) TO PROMOTE IMPROVEMENTS IN DIAGNOSIS AND PROVISION FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT. (IV) TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT APPROPRIATE RESEARCH INTO THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF THESE CONDITIONS AND ANY OTHER ISSUES AFFECTING THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS WITH THESE PRIMARY IMMUNE DEFICIENCIES AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THERE OF AND AS INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO ANY OF THESE OBJECTS THE COMPANY SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window