Accounts and annual returns AFRICAN WOMEN GROUP

Charity number: 1106612
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 April 2025 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 March 2025 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 April 2025 439 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 March 2023 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 March 2023 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 March 2023 402 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 March 2023 402 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 May 2021 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 May 2021 96 days late Download Open in new window